Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aleksander Moscicki

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Łomża, Poland

Titular Bishop of Doara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1898Born
6 Jun 192526.9Ordained PriestPriest
6 Feb 195253.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Łomża, Poland
6 Feb 195253.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Doara
25 Feb 195253.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Doara
25 Nov 198082.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Łomża, Poland

MicroData Summary for Aleksander Moscicki
Bishop Aleksander Moscicki (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Łomża

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTworkowice

  • a priest for 55.4 years
  • a bishop for 28.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast