Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mikolaj Sasinowski

Deceased

Bishop of Łomża, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1909Born
28 Mar 193626.3Ordained PriestPriest of Łomża, Poland
19 Mar 197060.3AppointedBishop of Łomża, Poland
5 Apr 197060.3Ordained BishopBishop of Łomża, Poland
6 Sep 198272.8DiedBishop of Łomża, Poland

MicroData Summary for Mikolaj Sasinowski
Bishop Mikolaj Sasinowski (born , died ) Bishop of Łomża

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMieczki

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast