Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marian Gołębiewski

Archbishop Emeritus of Wrocław {Breslavia}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1937 BornTrzebuchów
24 Jun 196224.8Ordained PriestPriest of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
20 Jul 199658.8AppointedBishop of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg, Poland
31 Aug 199658.9Ordained BishopBishop of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg, Poland
3 Apr 200466.5AppointedArchbishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland
24 Apr 200466.6InstalledArchbishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland
18 May 201375.7RetiredArchbishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland

MicroData Summary for Marian Gołębiewski:
Archbishop Marian Gołębiewski (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Wrocław {Breslavia}

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Wrocław {Breslavia}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,843
  • r: Bollettino, 18 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013