Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrzej Siemieniewski

Bishop of Legnica, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1957 Born
1 Jun 198527.8Ordained PriestPriest of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland
5 Jan 200648.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland
5 Jan 200648.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Theuzi
11 Feb 200648.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Theuzi
28 Jun 202163.8AppointedBishop of Legnica, Poland
20 Sep 202164.1InstalledBishop of Legnica, Poland

MicroData Summary for Andrzej Siemieniewski
Bishop Andrzej Siemieniewski (born ) Bishop of Legnica

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWrocław, Archdiocese of Wrocław {Breslavia}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Wrocław, Archdiocese of Wrocław {Breslavia}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Legnica.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Jan 2006
  • ob/c2: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,057
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2021
  • i: AM, 2 Jul 2021
  • i: CB, 10 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 20 Sep 2021

Quantcast