Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignacy Dec

Bishop Emeritus of Świdnica, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1944 Born
21 Jun 196924.9Ordained PriestPriest of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland
24 Feb 200459.5AppointedBishop of Świdnica, Poland
25 Mar 200459.6Ordained BishopBishop of Świdnica, Poland
31 Mar 202075.6RetiredBishop of Świdnica, Poland

MicroData Summary for Ignacy Dec
Bishop Ignacy Dec (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Świdnica

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHucisko
Ordained BishopCathedral, Świdnica, Diocese of Świdnica

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Świdnica.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,552
  • r: Bollettino, 31 Mar 2020
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 246, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Jul 2021

Quantcast