Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bolesław Cardinal Kominek

Deceased

Archbishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in via Flaminia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1903Born
11 Sep 192723.7Ordained PriestPriest of Katowice, Poland
26 Apr 195147.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland
26 Apr 195147.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Sophene
10 Oct 195450.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sophene
1 Dec 195652.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Vaga
19 Mar 196258.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Euchaitae
28 Jun 197268.5AppointedArchbishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland
5 Mar 197369.2Elevated to Cardinal
5 Mar 197369.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in via Flaminia
10 Mar 197470.2DiedArchbishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland

MicroData Summary for Bolesław Kominek
Bolesław Cardinal Kominek (born , died ) Archbishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRadlin
Ordained BishopPrzemyśl, Diocese of Przemyśl

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
  • a cardinal for 1.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19
  • c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.8, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 31 Mar 2020

Quantcast