Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Pazdur

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland

Titular Bishop of Ulcinium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1924Born
23 Dec 195127.0Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 198460.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland
18 Dec 198460.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Ulcinium
12 Jan 198560.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ulcinium
16 Nov 200075.9RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland
7 May 201590.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland

MicroData Summary for Józef Pazdur
Bishop Józef Pazdur (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Wrocław {Breslavia}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWola Skrzydlanska

  • a priest for 63.3 years
  • a bishop for 30.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 8 May 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast