Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adam Bałabuch

Auxiliary Bishop of Świdnica

Titular Bishop of Aurusuliana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1961 BornŚwidnica
24 Jun 198524.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland
24 May 198625.1Ordained PriestPriest of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland
25 Jun 200443.2IncardinatedPriest of Świdnica, Poland
19 Mar 200846.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Świdnica, Poland
19 Mar 200846.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Aurusuliana
8 May 200847.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aurusuliana

MicroData Summary for Adam Bałabuch:
Bishop Adam Bałabuch (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Świdnica

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Świdnica.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Mar 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,738

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013