Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Józef Kowalczyk

Archbishop Emeritus of Gniezno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1938 BornJadowniki Mokre, Poland
18 Mar 196122.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
14 Jan 196223.4Ordained PriestPriest of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
26 Aug 198951.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Heraclea
26 Aug 198951.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
20 Oct 198951.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Heraclea
8 May 201071.7AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
26 Jun 201071.8InstalledArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
17 May 201475.7RetiredArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

MicroData Summary for Józef Kowalczyk:
Archbishop Józef Kowalczyk (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Gniezno

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Gniezno.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 May 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,580
  • r: Bollettino, 17 May 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 7 Oct 2014