Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Stanisław Kazimierz Cardinal Nagy, S.C.I. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1921BornBieruń Stary, Poland
8 Jul 194523.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
7 Oct 200382.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hólar
13 Oct 200382.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Hólar
21 Oct 200382.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala
21 Oct 200382.0Elevated to Cardinal
5 Jun 201391.6DiedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala

MicroData Summary for Stanisław Kazimierz Nagy:
Stanisław Kazimierz Cardinal Nagy S.C.I. (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala

  • a priest for 67.9 years
  • a bishop for 9.6 years
  • a cardinal for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011, Page 69*
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Number 14,475
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015