Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanislaw Rospond

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Kraków {Cracow}

Titular Bishop of Dardanus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1877BornLiszki
10 Aug 190123.9Ordained PriestPriest of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
25 Mar 192749.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
25 Mar 192749.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Dardanus
12 Jun 192749.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dardanus
4 Feb 195880.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland

MicroData Summary for Stanislaw Rospond:
Bishop Stanislaw Rospond (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kraków {Cracow}

  • a priest for 56.5 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013