Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michał Godlewski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Lutsk

Titular Archbishop of Amorium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1872BornWarszawa
17 Jun 190027.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
24 Jun 190027.7Ordained PriestPriest of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
21 Oct 191644.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lutsk, Zhytomyr, and Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Łuck, Zytomierz, and Kamienec), Ukraine
21 Oct 191644.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Agbia
4 Feb 191744.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Agbia
14 Jan 194976.2ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Lutsk, Ukraine
14 Jan 194976.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Amorium
20 May 195683.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Lutsk, Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Michał Godlewski:
Archbishop Michał Godlewski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Lutsk

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 39.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,812
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 39
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1917, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013