Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanisław Padewski, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kharkiv-Zaporizhia, Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1932Born
28 Aug 195017.9ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
19 Sep 195321.0Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
24 Feb 195724.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
13 Apr 199562.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi, Ukraine
13 Apr 199562.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tigias
10 Jun 199562.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tigias
10 Oct 199866.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine
4 May 200269.6AppointedBishop of Kharkiv-Zaporizhia, Ukraine
19 Mar 200976.5RetiredBishop of Kharkiv-Zaporizhia, Ukraine
29 Jan 201784.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Kharkiv-Zaporizhia, Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Stanisław Padewski
Bishop Stanisław Padewski O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kharkiv-Zaporizhia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNova Huta
Death PlaceSędziszów Małopolski

  • a priest for 59.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Mar 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,594
  • d: CB, 29 Jan 2017
  • prof/sole: CB, 30 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 31 Jan 2017