Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Krzysztof Nitkiewicz

Bishop of Sandomierz, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1960 Born
19 Jun 198524.9Ordained PriestPriest of Białystok, Poland
13 Jun 200948.9AppointedBishop of Sandomierz, Poland
4 Jul 200948.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sandomierz, Poland

MicroData Summary for Krzysztof Nitkiewicz
Bishop Krzysztof Nitkiewicz (born ) Bishop of Sandomierz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBiałystok

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sandomierz.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Jun 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,245

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast