Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Sławoj Leszek Głódź

Archbishop of Gdańsk


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1945 BornBobrówka
14 Jun 197024.8Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jan 199145.4AppointedBishop of Poland, Military
21 Jan 199145.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Bettonium
23 Feb 199145.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bettonium
7 Mar 199852.6ResignedTitular Bishop of Bettonium
17 Jul 200458.9AppointedArchbishop of Poland, Military
26 Aug 200459.0AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Warszawa-Praga, Poland
2 Oct 200459.1InstalledBishop of Warszawa-Praga, Poland
17 Apr 200862.7AppointedArchbishop of Gdańsk, Poland
26 Apr 200862.7InstalledArchbishop of Gdańsk, Poland

MicroData Summary for Sławoj Leszek Głódź:
Archbishop Sławoj Leszek Głódź (born ) Archbishop of Gdańsk

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Gdańsk.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Apr 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,539
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Apr 2014