Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zbigniew Jan Zieliński

Auxiliary Bishop of Gdańsk, Poland

Titular Bishop of Medeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1965 Born
18 May 199126.3Ordained PriestPriest of Gdańsk, Poland
26 Sep 201550.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gdańsk, Poland
26 Sep 201550.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Medeli
24 Oct 201550.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Medeli

MicroData Summary for Zbigniew Jan Zieliński
Bishop Zbigniew Jan Zieliński (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Gdańsk

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGdańsk

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Gdańsk.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Sep 2015
  • c1/mn: CB, 26 Sep 2015
  • ob: CB, 9 Oct 2015
  • c2+: CB, 10 Oct 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,664

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast