Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wiesław Śmigiel

Bishop of Toruń, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1969 Born
20 Jun 199324.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Pelplin, Poland
29 May 199425.4Ordained PriestPriest of Pelplin, Poland
24 Mar 201243.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pelplin, Poland
24 Mar 201243.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Beatia
21 Apr 201243.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Beatia
11 Nov 201748.8AppointedBishop of Toruń, Poland
10 Dec 201748.9InstalledBishop of Toruń, Poland

MicroData Summary for Wiesław Śmigiel (VIAF: 8562337)
Bishop Wiesław Śmigiel (born ) Bishop of Toruń

EventPlace
Birth PlaceŚwiecie nad Wisłą
Ordained BishopCathedral Basilica, Pelplin, Diocese of Pelplin

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Toruń.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Mar 2012
  • ob/c2: CB, 24 Mar 2012
  • c34: CB, 8 Apr 2012
  • c2+: CB, 21 Apr 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,425
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast