Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arkadiusz Okroj

Auxiliary Bishop of Pelplin, Poland

Titular Bishop of Cufruta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1967 Born
6 Jun 199225.0Ordained PriestPriest of Pelplin, Poland
12 Feb 201951.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pelplin, Poland
12 Feb 201951.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Cufruta
2 Mar 201951.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cufruta

MicroData Summary for Arkadiusz Okroj
Bishop Arkadiusz Okroj (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Pelplin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKartuzy, Diocese of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)
Ordained BishopCathedral Basilica, Pelplin, Diocese of Pelplin

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pelplin.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Feb 2019
  • ob: CB, 12 Feb 2019
  • c34: CB, 1 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.3, 16 Feb 2019; Data: 2 Mar 2019

Quantcast