Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ryszard Kasyna

Bishop of Pelplin, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1957 Born
24 Jan 198224.3Ordained PriestPriest of Gdańsk, Poland
24 Jan 200547.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gdańsk, Poland
24 Jan 200547.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Dices
2 Apr 200547.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dices
27 Oct 201255.0AppointedBishop of Pelplin, Poland
8 Dec 201255.1InstalledBishop of Pelplin, Poland

MicroData Summary for Ryszard Kasyna
Bishop Ryszard Kasyna (born ) Bishop of Pelplin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNowy Staw

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pelplin.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 179, Number 14,843
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Oct 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast