Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wiesław Alojzy Mering

Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1945 Born
21 May 197226.4Ordained PriestPriest of Pelplin, Poland
25 Mar 200357.2AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
26 Apr 200357.3Ordained BishopBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

MicroData Summary for Wiesław Alojzy Mering
Bishop Wiesław Alojzy Mering (born ) Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZuków

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 171, Number 14,369

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018