Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zygfryd Ignacy Kowalski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

Titular Bishop of Assus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1910Born
17 Dec 193222.5Ordained PriestPriest
27 Feb 196251.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
27 Feb 196251.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Assus
29 Jun 196252.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Assus
22 Jun 199181.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
9 Oct 199585.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

MicroData Summary for Zygfryd Ignacy Kowalski (VIAF: 161847815)
Bishop Zygfryd Ignacy Kowalski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKoronowo

  • a priest for 62.8 years
  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 89
  • ob: CB, 15 Dec 2011
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • r: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1993, Page 797

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jul 2017