Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Wiktor Nowak

Deceased

Bishop of Siedlce, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1931Born
25 May 195624.6Ordained PriestPriest
20 Feb 198250.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland
20 Feb 198250.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Gemellae in Byzacena
25 Mar 198250.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gemellae in Byzacena
25 Mar 199664.4AppointedBishop of Siedlce, Poland
25 Mar 200270.4DiedBishop of Siedlce, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Wiktor Nowak
Bishop Jan Wiktor Nowak (born , died ) Bishop of Siedlce

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorun

  • a priest for 45.8 years
  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018