Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciszek Jedwabski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland

Titular Bishop of Maxula Prates


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1895Born
17 Dec 192227.8Ordained PriestPriest
12 Dec 194651.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland
12 Dec 194651.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Maxula Prates
2 Mar 194752.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maxula Prates
26 Jun 197580.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland

MicroData Summary for Franciszek Jedwabski
Bishop Franciszek Jedwabski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Poznań

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWilkowyja

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Apr 2017