Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Teodor Bensch

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland

Titular Bishop of Tentyris


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1903Born
12 Jun 193229.2Ordained PriestPriest
26 Apr 195148.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland
26 Apr 195148.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tabuda
21 Sep 195451.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tabuda
1 Dec 195653.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tentyris
7 Jan 195854.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland

MicroData Summary for Teodor Bensch (VIAF: 55326388)
Bishop Teodor Bensch (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuk

  • a priest for 25.5 years
  • a bishop for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,958
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,959

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast