Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Walenty Dymek

Deceased

Archbishop of Poznań, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1888Born
11 Feb 191223.1Ordained PriestPriest of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
10 May 192940.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
10 May 192940.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Madytus
26 May 192940.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Madytus
3 Jul 194556.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicopolis in Epiro
3 May 194657.3AppointedArchbishop of Poznań, Poland
22 Oct 195667.8DiedArchbishop of Poznań, Poland

MicroData Summary for Walenty Dymek
Archbishop Walenty Dymek (born , died ) Archbishop of Poznań

EventPlace
Birth PlacePolajewo

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Apr 2017