Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lucjan Bernacki

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno

Titular Bishop of Mela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1902BornGošcieradz
29 May 192623.9Ordained PriestPriest
4 Sep 194644.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland
4 Sep 194644.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Mela
24 Sep 194644.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mela
28 Sep 197573.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland

MicroData Summary for Lucjan Bernacki:
Bishop Lucjan Bernacki (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 29.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,818
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,872
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013