Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antoni Baraniak, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Poznań, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1904Born
3 Aug 193026.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
26 Apr 195147.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland
26 Apr 195147.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Theodosiopolis in Armenia
8 Jul 195147.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Theodosiopolis in Armenia
30 May 195753.4AppointedArchbishop of Poznań, Poland
13 Aug 197773.6DiedArchbishop of Poznań, Poland

MicroData Summary for Antoni Baraniak (VIAF: 102088811)
Archbishop Antoni Baraniak S.D.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Poznań

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSebastianowo

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 Apr 2017