Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tadeusz Werno

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg, Poland

Titular Bishop of Zattara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1931 Born
24 Jun 195624.8Ordained PriestPriest of Gorzów, Poland
22 Mar 197442.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg, Poland
22 Mar 197442.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Zattara
25 May 197442.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zattara
22 Sep 200776.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg, Poland

MicroData Summary for Tadeusz Werno
Bishop Tadeusz Werno (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKazimierz Wielkopolski
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Koszalin, Diocese of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Sep 2007
  • ob/c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 27, Number 1,510

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast