Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marek Jędraszewski

Archbishop of Kraków {Cracow}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1949 BornPoznań
24 May 197323.8Ordained PriestPriest of Poznań, Poland
17 May 199747.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland
17 May 199747.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Forum Popilii
29 Jun 199747.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Forum Popilii
11 Jul 201262.9AppointedArchbishop of Łódź, Poland
8 Sep 201263.1InstalledArchbishop of Łódź, Poland
8 Dec 201667.3AppointedArchbishop of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland

MicroData Summary for Marek Jędraszewski (VIAF: 101717422)
Archbishop Marek Jędraszewski (born ) Archbishop of Kraków {Cracow}

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 13,026
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2012
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Dec 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 9 Dec 2016