Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karol Kulczycki, S.D.S.

Bishop of Port Pirie, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1966 Born
8 Sep 198821.8First VowsMember of Society of the Divine Savior
1992²25.2Solemn VowsMember of Society of the Divine Savior
28 May 199427.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Savior
1 Aug 202053.7AppointedBishop of Port Pirie, Australia
29 Sep 202053.9Ordained BishopBishop of Port Pirie, Australia
28 Oct 202054.0InstalledBishop of Port Pirie, Australia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Karol Kulczycki
Bishop Karol Kulczycki S.D.S. (born ) Bishop of Port Pirie

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGóra, Archdiocese of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland
Ordained PriestTrzebinia, Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
Ordained BishopNajświętszego Serca Pana Jezusa, Basilica, Trzebinia, Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Port Pirie.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Aug 2020
  • ob/i: CB, 19 Aug 2020
  • c2+: JI, 21 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 29 Sep 2020

Quantcast