Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Adolfo Tito Camacho Yllana

Apostolic Nuncio to Israel

Titular Archbishop of Montecorvino

Apostolic Nuncio to Cyprus

Apostolic Delegate to Jerusalem and Palestine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1948 Born
19 Mar 197224.1Ordained PriestPriest of Caceres (Nueva Caceres), Philippines
13 Dec 200153.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Montecorvino
13 Dec 200153.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Papua New Guinea
6 Jan 200253.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Montecorvino
5 Feb 200253.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Solomon Islands
31 Mar 200658.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Pakistan
20 Nov 201062.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Congo, Democratic Republic of
17 Feb 201567.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Australia
3 Jun 202173.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Israel
3 Jun 202173.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Cyprus
3 Jun 202173.3AppointedApostolic Delegate to Jerusalem and Palestine

MicroData Summary for Adolfo Tito Camacho Yllana
Archbishop Adolfo Tito Camacho Yllana (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Israel

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNaga City, Archdiocese of Caceres (Nueva Caceres), Philippines
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Israel.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 31 Mar 2006
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Nov 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,096
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Feb 2015
  • mn: CB, 3 Aug 2015
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Jan 2020
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 Jun 2021

Quantcast