Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Nunciature to Papua New Guinea



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Mauro Lalli, Apostolic Nuncio

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Delegation to Papua New Guinea
5 March 1973SplitDelegation to Australia and Papua New Guinea Delegation to Papua New Guinea
Nunciature to Australia (and Elevated)
Delegation to Papua New Guinea and Solomon Islands
1 December 1975Name ChangedDelegation to Papua New Guinea Delegation to Papua New Guinea and Solomon Islands
7 March 1977SplitDelegation to Papua New Guinea and Solomon Islands Delegation to Solomon Islands
Nunciature to Papua New Guinea (and Elevated)
Nunciature to Papua New Guinea
7 March 1977SplitDelegation to Papua New Guinea and Solomon Islands Delegation to Solomon Islands
Nunciature to Papua New Guinea (and Elevated)

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Delegation to Papua New Guinea
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 66, Page 354
  • Delegation to Papua New Guinea and Solomon Islands
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 68, Page 171
  • Nunciature to Papua New Guinea
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 69, Page 256

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.7, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 17 Jun 2024