Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Santo Rocco Gangemi

Apostolic Nuncio to Guinea

Titular Archbishop of Umbriatico

Apostolic Nuncio to Mali


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1961 BornMessina, Italy
28 Jun 198624.8Ordained PriestPriest of Messina-Lipari-Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy
27 Jan 201250.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Solomon Islands
27 Jan 201250.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Umbriatico
17 Mar 201250.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Umbriatico
24 Mar 201250.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Papua New Guinea
16 Apr 201351.6ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Solomon Islands
16 Apr 201351.6ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Papua New Guinea
6 Nov 201352.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Guinea
5 Feb 201452.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Mali

MicroData Summary for Santo Rocco Gangemi:
Archbishop Santo Rocco Gangemi (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Guinea

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Guinea.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Jan 2012
  • ob/c2: CB, 15 Feb 2012
  • c4: CB, 17 Mar 2012
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Mar 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,273
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Nov 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Feb 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 28 May 2015