Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Calogero La Piana, S.D.B.

Archbishop of Messina-Lipari-Santa Lucia del Mela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1952 BornRiesi
12 Sep 197422.6ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
4 Apr 198129.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
8 Sep 198129.6Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
15 Nov 200250.8AppointedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
6 Jan 200350.9Ordained BishopBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
18 Nov 200654.8AppointedArchbishop of Messina-Lipari-Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy
13 Jan 200755.0InstalledArchbishop of Messina-Lipari-Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy

MicroData Summary for Calogero La Piana:
Archbishop Calogero La Piana S.D.B. (born ) Archbishop of Messina-Lipari-Santa Lucia del Mela

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Messina-Lipari-Santa Lucia del Mela.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Nov 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,305

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 6 Feb 2014