Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rufin Anthony

Deceased

Bishop of Islamabad-Rawalpindi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1940BornKhushpur
29 Jun 196929.3Ordained PriestPriest of Faisalabad, Pakistan
4 Aug 200969.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Islamabad-Rawalpindi, Pakistan
21 Sep 200969.6Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Islamabad-Rawalpindi, Pakistan
18 Feb 201070.0SucceededBishop of Islamabad-Rawalpindi, Pakistan
17 Mar 201272.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Faisalabad, Pakistan
1 Nov 201373.7CeasedApostolic Administrator of Faisalabad, Pakistan
17 Oct 201676.6DiedBishop of Islamabad-Rawalpindi, Pakistan

MicroData Summary for Rufin Anthony
Bishop Rufin Anthony (born , died ) Bishop of Islamabad-Rawalpindi

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Aug 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,280
  • s: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2010
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Mar 2012
  • d: CB, 17 Oct 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Oct 2016