Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Theodore Lobo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Islamabad-Rawalpindi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1937BornKarachi
8 Jan 196123.5Ordained PriestPriest of Karachi, Pakistan
8 Jun 198244.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Karachi, Pakistan
8 Jun 198244.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Oescus
1 Oct 198245.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Oescus
28 May 199355.8AppointedBishop of Islamabad-Rawalpindi, Pakistan
18 Feb 201072.6ResignedBishop of Islamabad-Rawalpindi, Pakistan
18 Feb 201375.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Islamabad-Rawalpindi, Pakistan

MicroData Summary for Anthony Theodore Lobo:
Bishop Anthony Theodore Lobo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Islamabad-Rawalpindi

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2010
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • d: CB, 18 Feb 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015