Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop James Cornelius van Miltenburg, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Hyderabad in Pakistan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1909BornHarmelen, Netherlands
31 Mar 193525.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
20 May 194838.7AppointedBishop of Karachi, Pakistan
3 Oct 194839.1Ordained BishopBishop of Karachi, Pakistan
15 Jul 195040.8AppointedArchbishop of Karachi, Pakistan
7 May 195848.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Hyderabad in Pakistan
14 Mar 196656.5DiedBishop of Hyderabad in Pakistan

MicroData Summary for James Cornelius van Miltenburg:
Archbishop James Cornelius van Miltenburg O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Hyderabad in Pakistan

  • a priest for 31.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 104

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013