Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Islamabad-Rawalpindi

Dioecesis Islamabadensis-Ravalpindensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Rufin Anthony, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 1 June 1979
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Lahore
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Pakistan
  • Square Kilometers: 178,341 (68,884 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, Tameezuddin Rd., Lalkurthi, Rawalpindi Cannt. 46000, Pakistan
  • Telephone: (051)558.16.16
  • Fax: 556.40.82

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Kafiristan e Kashmir
6 July 1887ErectedDiocese of Lahore Prefecture Apostolic of Kafiristan e Kashmir (erected)
Diocese of Rawalpindi
10 July 1947ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Kafiristan e Kashmir Diocese of Rawalpindi
17 January 1952Territory LostDiocese of Lahore
Diocese of Rawalpindi
Prefecture Apostolic of Kashmir and Jammu (erected)
Diocese of Islamabad-Rawalpindi
1 June 1979Name ChangedDiocese of Rawalpindi Diocese of Islamabad-Rawalpindi

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Rawalpindi
195012,82112,000,000.1%1363734610316ap1951
197037,34414,000,000.3%339428894812420ap1971
Diocese of Islamabad-Rawalpindi
198075,14524,520,000.3%1225372,0303396ap1981
1990105,68136,047,000.3%1320333,20226103ap1991
1999135,32835,000,000.4%179265,2041811321ap2000
2000171,80035,000,000.5%189276,362169919ap2001
2001248,19035,000,000.7%209298,5581510418ap2002
2002248,69635,000,000.7%229318,0221410418ap2003
2003276,77635,000,000.8%262289,884710318ap2004
2004168,13535,000,000.5%1421610,508610918ap2005
2006174,20836,522,000.5%146208,7101511818ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.1, 20 Jul 2013; data: 19 Aug 2013