Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Khalid Rehmat, O.F.M. Cap.

Vicar Apostolic of Quetta, Pakistan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1968 Born
28 Dec 200739.3Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
16 Aug 200840.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
1 Jan 202152.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Quetta, Pakistan
25 Mar 202152.6Ordained BishopVicar Apostolic of Quetta, Pakistan

MicroData Summary for Khalid Rehmat
Bishop Khalid Rehmat O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Quetta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMianwali, Diocese of Rawalpindi
Ordained BishopGrounds of, St. Francis Grammar School, Quetta, Vicariate Apostolic of Quetta

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Quetta.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Jan 2021
  • ob: CB, 5 Jan 2021
  • c2+: CB, 25 Mar 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 25 Mar 2021

Quantcast