Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Joseph Cardinal Coutts

Archbishop of Karachi, Pakistan

Cardinal-Priest of San Bonaventura da Bagnoregio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1945 Born
9 Jan 197125.4Ordained PriestPriest of Lahore, Pakistan
5 May 198842.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Hyderabad in Pakistan
16 Sep 198843.1Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Hyderabad in Pakistan
1 Sep 199045.1SucceededBishop of Hyderabad in Pakistan
27 Jun 199852.9AppointedBishop of Faisalabad, Pakistan
25 Jan 201266.5AppointedArchbishop of Karachi, Pakistan
28 Jun 201872.9Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 201872.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Bonaventura da Bagnoregio
29 Sep 201873.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Bonaventura da Bagnoregio

MicroData Summary for Joseph Coutts
Joseph Cardinal Coutts (born ) Archbishop of Karachi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmritsar
Ordained BishopS. Coeur, Cathedral, Lahore, Archdiocese of Lahore

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Karachi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 10,015
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Jan 2012
  • card: Bollettino, 20 May 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2018
  • i: Bollettino, 27 Sep 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 27 Sep 2018

Quantcast