Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Indrias Rehmat

Bishop of Faisalabad, Pakistan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1966 Born
25 Sep 199226.2Ordained PriestPriest of Faisalabad, Pakistan
29 Jun 201952.9AppointedBishop of Faisalabad, Pakistan
13 Sep 201953.1Ordained BishopBishop of Faisalabad, Pakistan

MicroData Summary for Joseph Indrias Rehmat
Bishop Joseph Indrias Rehmat (born ) Bishop of Faisalabad

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOkara, Diocese of Lyallpur
Ordained BishopDe La-Salle High School, People’s Colony, Faisalabad, Diocese of Faisalabad

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Faisalabad.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Jun 2019
  • ob: AM, 29 Jul 2019
  • ob: CB, 13 Aug 2019
  • c2+: CB, 17 Aug 2019
  • fn: CB, 14 Sep 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast