Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Benedetto Cialeo, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lyallpur


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1901BornCalitri
19 Apr 192422.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
15 Jan 193735.5AppointedPrefect of Multan, Pakistan
20 Jul 193938.0AppointedBishop of Multan, Pakistan
29 Oct 193938.3Ordained BishopBishop of Multan, Pakistan
13 Apr 196058.7AppointedBishop of Lyallpur, Pakistan
8 Sep 197675.1RetiredBishop of Lyallpur, Pakistan
4 Jan 198583.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Lyallpur, Pakistan

MicroData Summary for Francesco Benedetto Cialeo:
Bishop Francesco Benedetto Cialeo O.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lyallpur

  • a priest for 60.7 years
  • a bishop for 45.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1939, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015