Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Vieri Andreotti, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Faisalabad, Pakistan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1921Born
5 Apr 194725.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
6 May 197250.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lyallpur, Pakistan
6 May 197250.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Afufenia
29 Jun 197250.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Afufenia
8 Sep 197654.7AppointedBishop of Lyallpur, Pakistan
9 Jan 198462.0ResignedBishop of Faisalabad, Pakistan
10 Jul 199573.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Faisalabad, Pakistan

MicroData Summary for Paolo Vieri Andreotti
Bishop Paolo Vieri Andreotti O.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Faisalabad

EventPlace
Birth PlacePrataccio (Piteglio), Italy

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018