Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Simeon Anthony Pereira

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Karachi, Pakistan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1927Born
24 Aug 195123.8Ordained PriestPriest of Karachi, Pakistan
3 Jul 197143.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rawalpindi, Pakistan
3 Jul 197143.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Badiae
7 Oct 197143.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Badiae
17 Dec 197346.1AppointedBishop of Rawalpindi, Pakistan
22 Mar 199365.4AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Karachi, Pakistan
11 Feb 199466.3SucceededArchbishop of Karachi, Pakistan
20 Nov 200275.0RetiredArchbishop of Karachi, Pakistan
21 Aug 200678.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Karachi, Pakistan

MicroData Summary for Simeon Anthony Pereira
Archbishop Simeon Anthony Pereira (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Karachi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSukkur

  • a priest for 54.9 years
  • a bishop for 34.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast