Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Karachi

Archidioecesis Karachiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Joseph Coutts, Archbishop
  • Evarist Pinto, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 15 July 1950
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Pakistan
  • Square Kilometers: 180,000 (69,525 Square Miles)
  • Description: The city of Karachi with its five districts, namely, Karachi Central, South, West, East and Malir.
  • Official Web Site: http://www.karachi-archdiocese.org/
  • Mailing Address: St. Patrick's Cathedral, Saddar, Karachi 74400, Pakistan
  • Telephone: (021)3278.15.33
  • Fax: 3278.15.32

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Karachi
20 May 1948ErectedArchdiocese of Bombay Diocese of Karachi (erected)
Archdiocese of Karachi
15 July 1950ElevatedDiocese of Karachi Archdiocese of Karachi
28 April 1958Territory LostArchdiocese of Karachi Diocese of Hyderabad in Pakistan (erected)
9 November 2001Territory LostDiocese of Hyderabad in Pakistan
Archdiocese of Karachi
Prefecture Apostolic of Quetta (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Karachi
195022,9067,500,000.3%154459388169816ap1951
197040,2005,000,000.8%4423676003115713ap1971
198060,0006,294,0001.0%4118591,01613815516ap1981
199075,0006,400,0001.2%5015651,15313117517ap1991
1999141,3071,000,00014.1%3914532,6663818818ap2000
2000152,74911,500,0001.3%3914532,8822518118ap2001
2001149,35011,000,0001.4%3825632,3705316519ap2002
2002150,26311,000,0001.4%3726632,3853615218ap2003
2003142,00013,000,0001.1%3415492,8975815715ap2004
2004145,00014,000,0001.0%3414483,0205315715ap2005
2006151,00014,608,0001.0%3211433,5115015715ap2007
2011166,00015,802,0001.1%2611374,4863516515ap2012

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.7, 12 Feb 2013; data: 18 Feb 2013