Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Ajmer

Dioecesis Aimerensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Pius Thomas D’Souza, Bishop
  • Ignatius Menezes, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 20 July 2005
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Agra
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 146,680 (56,655 Square Miles)
  • Description: Ajmer, Jodhpur, Kota, Barmer, Bundi, Jalore, Jhalwar, Pali, Sirohi, Tonk, Jaisalmer, and Baran
  • Official Web Site: http://www.ajmerdiocese.org/
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, Kaiserganj, Ajmer-305001, Rajasthan, India
  • Telephone: (0145) 2460.074
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Rajputana
1890ErectedArchdiocese of Agra Mission "Sui Iuris" of Rajputana (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Rajputana
1891ElevatedMission "Sui Iuris" of Rajputana Prefecture Apostolic of Rajputana
Diocese of Ajmer
22 May 1913ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Rajputana Diocese of Ajmer
11 March 1935Territory LostDiocese of Ajmer (Part of the Administration of Central India, which is south of the Administration of Rajputana, the Prefecture (tahsil) of Thandla, the districts of Isaghar and Mandasor, and the State of Sitaman)
Diocese of Allahabad (State of Bhopal and the district of Bhilsa)
Diocese of Nagpur (District of Eoshangabad (except Pachmari), district of Nimar, State of Barwani, and that part of the States of Indore and Dhar, which lies to the south of the river Narbada)
Prefecture Apostolic of Indore (erected)
21 June 1951Territory AddedArchdiocese of Agra (Bandikui and Alwar) Diocese of Ajmer
8 May 1955Territory LostDiocese of Ajmer (Multan) Diocese of Rawalpindi
Diocese of Ajmer and Jaipur
13 May 1955Name ChangedDiocese of Ajmer Diocese of Ajmer and Jaipur
13 September 1963Territory LostDiocese of Ajmer and Jaipur (Raisen)
Diocese of Indore (Bhopal, Sehore, Vishisha, and Hoshangabad)
Diocese of Jabalpur (Sagar)
Archdiocese of Bhopal (erected)
2 April 1973Territory LostDiocese of Ajmer and Jaipur (Guna) Archiepiscopal Exarchate of Sagar (Syro-Malabar)
11 March 1981Territory LostDiocese of Ajmer and Jaipur (Mandsaur in Madhya Pradesh) Diocese of Indore
3 December 1984Territory LostDiocese of Ajmer and Jaipur (Bhilwara, Udaipur, Chittorgarh, Dungarpur, and Manswara (in Rajasthan) along with tehsil of Thandla in Madhya Pradesh) Diocese of Udaipur (erected)
20 July 2005Territory LostDiocese of Ajmer and Jaipur (Jaipur, Dausa, Alwar, Sawai Madhopur, Karoli, Nagaur, Sikar, Hanumangarh, Jhunjhumu, Churu, Ganganagar, and Bikaner) Diocese of Jaipur (erected)
Diocese of Ajmer
20 July 2005Name ChangedDiocese of Ajmer and Jaipur Diocese of Ajmer

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Ajmer
19507,22510,893,212.1%272552138664ap1951
Diocese of Ajmer and Jaipur
195910,20216,600,000.1%3921601701034528ap1960
197017,87520,500,000.1%5715722483047114ap1971
198025,27333,660,000.1%6415793194357811ap1981
19909,84631,500,000.0%372158169324738ap1991
199912,45940,323,500.0%492372173335558ap2000
200012,74641,031,600.0%522577165325638ap2001
200112,86946,435,014.0%5327801603355111ap2002
200213,11946,899,364.0%5428821593455811ap2003
200313,20646,888,150.0%5230821613860412ap2004
200413,28643,550,000.0%4930791683859312ap2005
Diocese of Ajmer
20069,19017,606,347.1%331043213153768ap2007
20129,32019,827,000.0%3814521792141810ap2013
20159,98022,360,000.0%3821591692847014ap2016
20187,52123,208,860.0%4823711052645812ap2019
20207,68023,697,200.0%5021711082447112ap2021
20227,63023,533,000.0%5223751012648512ap2023

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Ajmer
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 44, Page 45
  • Diocese of Ajmer and Jaipur
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 47, Page 859

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 14 Apr 2024