Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fortunat-Henri Caumont, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ajmer


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1871BornTours, France
27 Jan 190331.1AppointedPrefect of Rajputana, India
22 May 191341.4AppointedBishop of Ajmer, India
28 Oct 191341.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ajmer, India
4 Apr 193058.3DiedBishop of Ajmer, India

MicroData Summary for Fortunat-Henri Caumont:
Bishop Fortunat-Henri Caumont O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Ajmer

  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913, Number 65
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013