Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Godefroid Pelckmans, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lahore, Pakistan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1854Born
21 Dec 187824.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
2 Jun 189339.3AppointedBishop of Lahore, Pakistan
13 Aug 189339.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lahore, Pakistan
3 Aug 190450.5DiedBishop of Lahore, Pakistan

MicroData Summary for Godefroid Pelckmans
Bishop Godefroid Pelckmans O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Lahore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTurnhout, Belgium
Ordained BishopSts Michael and Joseph, Church, Simla

  • a priest for 25.6 years
  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 331
  • b/c2+: CB, 28 Jan 2017
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017