Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Brice Meuleman, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Calcutta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1862BornGand, Belgium
20 Jan 189532.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
21 Mar 190240.1AppointedArchbishop of Calcutta, India
25 May 190240.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Calcutta, India
23 Jun 192462.3ResignedArchbishop of Calcutta, India
15 Jul 192462.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Calcutta, India

MicroData Summary for Brice Meuleman:
Archbishop Brice Meuleman S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Calcutta

  • a priest for 29.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 172
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1902, Number 25
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 103

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013