Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Agra

Archidioecesis AgraŽnsis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Albert D’Souza, Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 1 September 1886
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 69,162 (26,713 Square Miles)
  • Description: consists of the following districts in Uttar Pradesh: Agra, Aligarh, Auraiya, Budaun, Bulandshahr, Etah, Etawah, Farrukabad, Fathegarh, Firozabad, Gautambudha Nagar, Hathras, Kannauj, Mainpuri, Mathura and in Rajasthan, Bharatpur and Dholpur.
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's House, Wazirpura Road, Agra-282003, U.P., India
  • Telephone: (0562) 2851.318
  • Fax: 2527.208

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Hindustan
17 May 1784ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Great Mogul (Mughals) Mission "Sui Iuris" of Hindustan (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Tibet-Hindustan
1820ElevatedMission "Sui Iuris" of Hindustan Vicariate Apostolic of Tibet-Hindustan
Vicariate Apostolic of Agra
1846Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Tibet-Hindustan Vicariate Apostolic of Agra
Archdiocese of Agra
1 September 1886ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Agra Archdiocese of Agra
13 September 1910Territory LostArchdiocese of Agra
Diocese of Lahore
Archdiocese of Simla (erected)
12 January 1940Territory LostArchdiocese of Agra
Diocese of Allahabad
Diocese of Lucknow (erected)
20 February 1956Territory LostArchdiocese of Agra Diocese of Meerut (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Agra
195012,20012,000,000.1%6344030568622ap1951
19593,20511,000,000.0%38112913366ap1960
19694,96512,200,000.0%3151827521904ap1971
19804,96114,504,961.0%11718275131255ap1981
19908,10016,863,000.0%31536225121666ap1991
199911,11627,003,487.0%371047236182116ap2000
200011,80427,008,973.0%411455214212117ap2001
200111,94027,024,295.0%441761195262247ap2002
200212,08427,053,045.0%461561198222247ap2003
200312,92527,088,913.0%371350258202297ap2004
200412,50027,130,781.0%481058215172347ap2005
200612,64727,228,264.0%691180158172488ap2007
201217,03229,188,000.1%6617832052229435ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 6 Nov 2013